THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 3:43:53 AM
Rana, Robina Iftikhar
CPSO#:
95315
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Allama Iqbal Medical College, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
York Professional Building
679 Davis Drive
Unit 204
Newmarket ON L3Y 5G8
Phone: (905) 235-8881
Fax: 905-235-8861
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 May 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:21 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBINA IFTIKHAR RANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 26 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism