THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 20:30:16 PM
Fernando, Judith
CPSO#:
95299
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jul 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jul 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Halwala, Madupriyani Judith (used until: 11 Mar 2014 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Latvian State University, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 May 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:27 Sep 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JUDITH FERNANDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERNANDO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Jan 2012
AVP - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 16 Jan 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 24 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Sep 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2017 |