THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 3:48:47 AM
Haider, Atika
CPSO#:
95297
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Feb 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Feb 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: Ziauddin Medical University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
A13-9600 Islington Ave
Woodbridge ON L4H 2T1
Phone: 9058938085
Fax: 9058938218
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ATIKA HAIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAIDER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 13 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Jan 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Feb 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Feb 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 2015 |