THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 21:57:50 PM
Yau, Gary Lloyd Ka Tao
CPSO#:
95294
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 May 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 May 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 400
2065 Finch Ave W
North York ON M3N 2V7
Phone: (416) 748-2020
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GARY LLOYD KA TAO YAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 May 2017 |