THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 8:50:31 AM
Seong, Augene
CPSO#:
95290
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
06 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Korean
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Augene Seong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Date Received: 25 May 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Jun 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:16 Oct 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Aug 2017 |