THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:09:18 AM
Yu, Ryan Shange
CPSO#:
95223
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Quinte Health Care
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Quinte Healthcare Corporation |
Belleville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Pathology |
Effective:25 May 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RYAN SHANGE YU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2018 |