THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:47:15 AM
Kirk, Gary Marc
CPSO#:
95196
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
11 Apr 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Windsor-Essex County Health
1005 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON N9A 4J8
Date Received: 12 Apr 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
USA - Wisconsin
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Dec 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Dec 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 19 Oct 2018 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Apr 2019 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: October 19, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Gary Marc Kirk to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective October 19, 2018:
Dr. Kirk has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.