THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:43:31 AM
Pincock, Robert James
CPSO#:
95192
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Jun 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Belleville Queen's University
Family Medicine Centre
Unit 104
145 Station Street
Belleville ON K8N 2S9
Phone: (613) 771-1910
Fax: (613) 771-0689
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Quinte Healthcare Corporation |
Belleville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:29 Jun 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT JAMES PINCOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PINCOCK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 02 Jun 2011 to 29 Jun 2011
EL - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2011 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 2020 |