THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 13:11:49 PM
Schellenberg, Morgan Anne
CPSO#:
95160
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Mar 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Mar 2024
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2051 Marengo St
Inpatient Tower C5L100
Los Angeles CA 90033-1352
United States
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MORGAN ANNE SCHELLENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHELLENBERG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Mar 2024 |