THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:13:20 AM
Austin, Emily Beth
CPSO#:
95149
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5095
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology |
Effective:26 Sep 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EMILY BETH AUSTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUSTIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Mar 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Executive Committee |
Effective: 30 May 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Aug 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |