THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 15:20:55 PM
Saleh, Maha Safey El-Din
CPSO#:
95148
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Maha Saleh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 8 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Genetics and Genomics |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAHA SAFEY EL-DIN SALEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALEH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |