THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 10:10:17 AM
Landry, Bret Allan
CPSO#:
95112
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
27 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:St Michaels Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Date Received: 05 May 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 Jun 2017 |