THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:21:47 AM
Morris, Christopher Thomas
CPSO#:
95105
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
115 - 89 Dawson Rd
Guelph ON N1H 1B1
Phone: (519) 824-7272
Fax: (519) 824-0833
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site |
Kitchener |
Groves Memorial Community Hospital |
Fergus |
Guelph General Hospital |
Guelph |
Hanover and District Hospital |
Hanover |
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care |
Mount Forest |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER THOMAS MORRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2016 |