THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 7:36:35 AM
Klein, Shawn Ian
CPSO#:
95097
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jan 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jan 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
347 Rumsey Rd
UHN - Toronto Rehabilitation Instit
Rumsey Centre
Toronto ON M4G 1R7
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 5200
Fax: (416) 425-0301
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Rumsey Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Dec 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAWN IAN KLEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KLEIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Oct 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Jan 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2014 |