THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 22:03:43 PM
Chen, Jeyla Xiao Meng
CPSO#:
95096
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 5080
3080 Yonge Street
Toronto ON M4N 3N1
Phone: (416) 782-4447
Fax: (416) 782-1284
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:26 Jun 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JEYLA XIAO MENG CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 09 Sep 2013 to 29 Nov 2013
CF - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 2013 |