THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 18:13:09 PM
Howey, Joanne Margaret
CPSO#:
95088
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Sep 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London X-Ray Associates
104 - 450 Central Ave
London ON N6B 2E8
Phone: (519) 672-7900
Fax: (519) 672-8731
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital |
Goderich |
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance |
Chatham |
Four Counties Health Services |
Newbury |
Listowel Memorial Hospital |
Listowel |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre |
Kincardine |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site |
Chesley |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site |
Durham |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site |
Walkerton |
South Huron Hospital Association |
Exeter |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital |
Strathroy |
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital |
Tillsonburg |
Wingham and District Hospital |
Wingham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:18 Sep 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOANNE MARGARET HOWEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOWEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 11 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 12 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 11 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 12 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 29 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 15 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 16 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 15 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 16 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 18 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 19 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 18 Sep 2018
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2017 |