THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 20:17:20 PM
Henry, Melanie Joy
CPSO#:
95087
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Health For All
379 Church Street, 202
Markham ON L6B 0T1
Phone: (905) 472-2200
Fax: 905-472-5662
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:07 Oct 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MELANIE JOY HENRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENRY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 24 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 25 Aug 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jun 2015 |