THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 17:23:21 PM
Lai, Carolyn Siu Wuan
CPSO#:
95086
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Jul 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Jul 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
USA - California
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CAROLYN SIU WUAN LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 31 Jul 2020
CF - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 31 Dec 2021
CF - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 2018 |