THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 13:24:49 PM
Aref, Mohammed Hani M
CPSO#:
95064
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
06 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Gulf Medical College Ajman, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Colorado
USA - Washington
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jun 2011 to 06 Jul 2011
PEAP - R - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 07 Jul 2011 to 06 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 07 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 06 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 07 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 06 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 07 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 06 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 07 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 06 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
McMaster University, 07 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Jul 2020 |