THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:53:52 AM
Madan, Pooja
CPSO#:
95052
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Oct 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
31 Oct 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Saint James School of Medicine, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2311 N. Prospect Avenue
Milwaukee WI 53211
United States
Phone: (414) 319-3000
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Pooja Madan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 29 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Wisconsin
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:31 Oct 2012 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
EL - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Feb 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Apr 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 17 Apr 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Apr 2014 |
|
Active |