THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 6:33:10 AM
Korzeniowski, Martin Arthur
CPSO#:
95051
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: McMaster University, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences
Division of Radiation Oncology
25 King Street West
Kingston ON K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 5496666 Ext. 8106
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARTIN ARTHUR KORZENIOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KORZENIOWSKI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 2017 |