THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 20:48:07 PM
Shanmugam, Ganesh
CPSO#:
95034
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 May 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 May 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: Tamil Nadu Dr. M.G.R. Medical University, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Section of Cardiac Surgery
Foothills Medical Centre
Room C831
1403 29th Street NW
Calgary AB T2N 2T9
Phone: (403) 944-8443
Fax: (403) 944-2906
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Ganesh Shanmugam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 11 2016
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiac Surgery |
Effective:22 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GANESH SHANMUGAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHANMUGAM is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 May 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 May 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 17 May 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 May 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 May 2012 |