THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 15:20:45 PM
Rudovics, Andrejs
CPSO#:
95032
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
08 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
104 Wolf Willow Cove
Hinton AB T7V 0B2
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. A. Rudovics Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 8 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
EL - Colorectal Surgery
University of Toronto, 09 Jan 2012 to 03 Feb 2012
EL - General Surgery
McMaster University, 14 Feb 2012 to 31 Mar 2012
EL - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Feb 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Sep 2021 |