THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 16:43:54 PM
Alsharekh, Monther M A M H
CPSO#:
95023
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jul 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:07 May 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 May 2011 to 19 Jun 2011
EL - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 04 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 05 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 04 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 05 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 May 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |