THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 19:43:49 PM
Abdel Meguid, Abdel Meguid Kamel
CPSO#:
95015
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
26 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Mar 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: A.K.Abdel Meguid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 25 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Past patients can obtain copies of their files by contacting the Streetsville Glen Medical Centre.
Streetsville Glen Medical Centre, Unit 1B, 7955 Financial Drive, Brampton ON, L6Y 0J8, Phone (905) 455-8877, Fax (905) 455-8867
Date Received: 07 Oct 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Dec 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jun 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 May 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Mar 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Mar 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 Jul 2021 |