THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 0:46:49 AM
Potvin, Nicholas Anthony
CPSO#:
95000
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Oct 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Oct 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 670
Clinton ON N0M1L0
Phone: 5194823000
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital |
Goderich |
Clinton Public Hospital |
Clinton |
Lady Dunn Health Centre |
Wawa |
Listowel Memorial Hospital |
Listowel |
North of Superior Healthcare Group-Wilson Memorial General H,ospital |
Marathon |
Sante Manitouwadge Health |
Manitouwadge |
Seaforth Community Hospital |
Seaforth |
Sensenbrenner Hospital |
Kapuskasing |
South Huron Hospital Association |
Exeter |
Stratford General Hospital |
Stratford |
Wingham and District Hospital |
Wingham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:07 Jul 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:08 Oct 2019 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS ANTHONY POTVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POTVIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 09 May 2011 to 20 May 2011
EL - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 May 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 May 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Oct 2018 |