THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 17:15:41 PM
Dutta, Usha
CPSO#:
94997
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
15 Jan 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
02 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: All-India Institute of Medical Sciences, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 May 2011 to 01 Jun 2011
PEAP - CF - Gastroenterology
McMaster University, 02 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Gastroenterology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Gastroenterology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 15 Jan 2013
CF - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jan 2013 |