THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 9:57:56 AM
Alali, Alaa Y A A
CPSO#:
94979
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
17 May 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 May 2011 to 31 May 2011
PEAP - R - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 May 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jul 2019 |