THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:17:56 AM
Smoragiewicz, Martin
CPSO#:
94955
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Dec 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Dec 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Polish
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-4617
Fax: 416-480-6002
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARTIN SMORAGIEWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMORAGIEWICZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Apr 2011 to 08 May 2011
EL - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Apr 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 May 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 2017 |