THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 5:26:43 AM
Abraham, Natalia
CPSO#:
94949
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Nov 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Nov 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Public Health Agency of Canada
130 Colonnade Rd
Ottawa ON K1A 0K9
Phone: 1-844-280-5020
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Public Health and Preventive Medicine |
Effective:15 Sep 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NATALIA ABRAHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABRAHAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 12 Apr 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
EL - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 23 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Ottawa, 24 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 13 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Ottawa, 14 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 05 Jan 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Ottawa, 06 Jan 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 10 Feb 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Ottawa, 11 Feb 2020 to 15 May 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Apr 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 May 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 May 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 2020 |