THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:45:21 AM
Bahathig, Ali Mohammed A
CPSO#:
94920
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
31 Aug 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 May 2011 to 24 Jul 2011
PEAP - R - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 25 Jul 2011 to 24 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 25 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 24 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 25 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 24 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 25 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 24 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 25 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Aug 2018
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 May 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Jul 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2018 |