THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 19:57:06 PM
Sieniawski, Rafal
CPSO#:
94916
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jan 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Jan 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4440 Tecumseh Rd E
Central Cardiology Clinic
Windsor ON N8W 1K5
Phone: (519) 916-0993
Fax: (519) 916-0994
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:02 Oct 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAFAL SIENIAWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIENIAWSKI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Mar 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Mar 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 23 Sep 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Apr 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 18 Apr 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Jan 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2014 |