THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 3:04:26 AM
Kandel, Sonja Marion
CPSO#:
94911
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Sep 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
05 Sep 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: Hamburg University, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Medical Imaging
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 323-6400 Ext. 4081
Fax: (416) 323-7325
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:28 Aug 2020 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:07 May 2021 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2011 to 17 May 2011
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 18 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 23 Mar 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 May 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Aug 2020 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 May 2021 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 May 2021 |
|
Active |