THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 23:22:10 PM
LeBlanc, Justin Eugene Matthew
CPSO#:
94910
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
18 Oct 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 21 Mar 2011 to 10 Apr 2011
EL - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2012 to 31 Jul 2013
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Mar 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Apr 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Oct 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2013 |