THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:15:54 AM
Ascher, Ilana Stephanie
CPSO#:
94904
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Dec 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
14 Dec 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Schiffman, Ilana Stephanie (used until: 17 Jul 2011 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Ross University School of Medicine, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
5927 Bathurst Street
Toronto, ONT
M2R 3T5
Toronto ON M2R 3T5
Phone: (416) 652-9630
Fax: (416) 224-9630
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
USA - Illinois
USA - Texas
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Dec 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Mar 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Mar 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 16 Mar 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Dec 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Dec 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jul 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 12 Jul 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jul 2013 |
|
Active |