THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 19:50:24 PM
Gilman, Ashley Read
CPSO#:
94902
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Dec 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Dec 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
160 Bloor St E
Hannam Fertility Centre
Toronto ON M4W 1B9
Phone: 416-595-1521
Fax: 416-506-0680
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility |
Effective:26 Sep 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ASHLEY READ GILMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 28 Mar 2011 to 08 Apr 2011
EL - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 18 Oct 2013
EL - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Mar 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Apr 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Oct 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Dec 2015 |