THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 23:43:00 PM
Donahoe, Laura Lynn
CPSO#:
94896
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
9N-950, 200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-340-4800 Ext. 6529
Fax: 416-340-4556
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:01 Oct 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LAURA LYNN DONAHOE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DONAHOE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2011 to 31 May 2011
EL - Thoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 09 Jan 2012 to 30 Mar 2012
EL - Thoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Thoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Mar 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |