THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 0:57:40 AM
Bhalla, Jaswinder
CPSO#:
94886
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Mar 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 May 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Jiwaji University, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1485 Bancroft drive
Sudbury ON P3B 1R6
Phone: 705-222-6287
Fax: 705 222 6288
Electoral District: 08
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Aug 2005 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JASWINDER BHALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHALLA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Mar 2011 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 21 Feb 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 May 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: February 21, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: February 21, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)