THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 14:44:17 PM
Akef, Reza
CPSO#:
94883
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Feb 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Feb 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
7191 Yonge St
Unit 910
Thornhill ON L3T 0C4
Phone: 905597-2030
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Dec 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:21 Oct 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. REZA AKEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKEF is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 08 Mar 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Feb 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Feb 2012 |