THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 14:13:16 PM
Hashim, Shahzad
CPSO#:
94882
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Mar 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
09 Mar 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Aga Khan University, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Division of Nephrology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 3470
Fax: (905) 813-3830
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 Mar 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:13 Jan 2015 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 08 Sep 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Aug 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Aug 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Jan 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jul 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jul 2016 |
|
Active |