THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 18:13:25 PM
Mohamed Lamine, Mohamed Hacen
CPSO#:
94875
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Mar 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Mar 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 103
640 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON L5R 3V2
Phone: 9052680520
Fax: 9052680521
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMED HACEN MOHAMED LAMINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMED LAMINE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Mar 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Mar 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 21 Feb 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 May 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Apr 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Aug 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Mar 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Mar 2015 |