THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 6:30:40 AM
Paradiso, Monica Celina
CPSO#:
94871
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Oct 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jan 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
202A-124 Merton St
Toronto ON M4S 2Z2
Phone: (416)395-1699
Fax: (416)395-1699
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:11 May 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MONICA CELINA PARADISO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARADISO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Mar 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 May 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Oct 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Oct 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jan 2022 |