THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 11:33:07 AM
Brozek, Jan Ludwik
CPSO#:
94862
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
28 Feb 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Health Sciences Centre
HSC 2C19
1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 525-9140 Ext. 22936
Fax: (905) 522-9507
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Poland
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:28 Feb 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Feb 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Feb 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Oct 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jun 2018 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 05 Jul 2019 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Jul 2019 |
|
Active |