THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 2:58:31 AM
Alsaleh, Yasser
CPSO#:
94830
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
28 Jan 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 May 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Damascus Faculty of Medici, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 17 Feb 2011 to 12 May 2011
PEAP - CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 May 2011 to 12 May 2012
CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 May 2012 to 28 Jan 2013
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 17 Feb 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 May 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Jan 2013 |