THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 6:02:27 AM
McKelvie, Brianna Lynn
CPSO#:
94825
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Dec 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
401 Smyth Rd
Children's Hospital of Eastern Onta
Pediatric critical care
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:21 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRIANNA LYNN MCKELVIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKELVIE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 22 Feb 2011 to 11 Mar 2011
EL - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2012 to 12 Feb 2012
EL - Paediatric Critical Care
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Critical Care
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
CF - Paediatric Critical Care
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Feb 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Mar 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Feb 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Dec 2015 |