THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 12:35:55 PM
Yang, Jianing
CPSO#:
94814
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
07 Feb 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2529 Rue Allard
CENTRE MEDICAL METRO MONK
Montréal QC H4E 2L5
Phone: 5147699999
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Jianing Yang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Please contact Clinic Source Unique Hawkesbury for your medical charts
Clinic Source Unique Hawkesbury
613-632-4185
Date Received: 05 Aug 2014
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:19 Dec 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Feb 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Feb 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 02 Feb 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Mar 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Apr 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Feb 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 2014 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Feb 2023 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 07 Feb 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
member |
Effective: 07 Feb 2023 |
|
Active |