THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 0:30:21 AM
Inman, Mark George
CPSO#:
94812
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 May 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:21 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 14 Feb 2011 to 11 Mar 2011
EL - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 13 Feb 2012 to 02 Mar 2012
EL - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Mar 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Feb 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Mar 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 May 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2015 |