THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 12:47:20 PM
Ribeiro, Igo Barbosa
CPSO#:
94802
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jan 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: Universidade Federal Do Ceara, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Ohio
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: July 4, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On July 4, 2022, Kingston Health Sciences Centre (the “Hospital”) notified the College, pursuant to s.33(d) of the Public Hospitals Act and s. 85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Ribeiro resigned from the Hospital.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiac Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2011 to 25 Mar 2011
PEAP - CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
CF - Cardiac Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Vascular Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 18 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 19 Dec 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 17 Dec 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery
University of Ottawa, 18 Dec 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2020 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2022 |