THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 7:48:58 AM
Juergens, Rosalyn Anne
CPSO#:
94794
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jan 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
26 Jan 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Georgetown University, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
HHSC Juravinski Cancer Centre
Department of Medical Oncology
3rd Floor
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495 Ext. 63123
Fax: (905) 575-6326
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Maryland
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:26 Jan 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Jan 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jan 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 25 Jul 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jan 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 06 Feb 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jan 2014 |
|
Active |