THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 10:55:43 AM
Canton, Toni Jo
CPSO#:
94788
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Feb 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
14 Feb 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: University of California, San Diego, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
200-1017 Wilson Ave
North York ON M3K 1Z1
Phone: (416) 636-5500
Fax: (416) 636-5501
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Feb 2013 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 07 Feb 2011 to 20 Feb 2011
EL - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 02 May 2011 to 15 May 2011
EL - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 09 Apr 2012 to 29 Apr 2012
EL - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Feb 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Feb 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 May 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 May 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Apr 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Apr 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Jul 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 01 Aug 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Jul 2014 |
|
Active |